Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cepeda Juan Rojas, Morales Angelica, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian Edwin, Davis Heather Marie, Nayebdadash Amir, against Paris Baguette America Inc., Paris Baguette - Bon Doux Inc., Paris Baguette Family Inc., Paris Baguette U.S.A. Inc., represented by Cabrera Krista, Cabrera Krista M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: December 04, 2020Complaint; Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Paris Baguette America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Message Board Posting to continue May 20 hearing to May 26, 2021; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Message Board Posting; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement Joint Further; Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Complex Designation) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Order Authoriizing Electronic Service-Case Anywhere; Signed and Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by: Juan Rojas Cepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Taking Motion Off-Calendar, via e-mail; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 01/08/2021)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney (Notice of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of first amended class action complaint)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order (Authoriizing Electronic Service-Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Timothy McCoy #4745)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Juan Rojas Cepeda in Support of his Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Message Board Posting (to continue May 20 hearing to May 26, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Defendants' Reply in Support of Renewed Notion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Angela Albarez #4344)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Procee...))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Telephonic; Conference Telephonic))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (On Defendants' Renewed Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Court Proceedings)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Message Board Posting
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement (Joint Further)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Of Hearing on Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Further Statu...))
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Demurrer To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Second Amen...))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.