Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Scheer Robert, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case against Truthdig Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Kaufman Zuade, represented by Valle Jeffrey B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PURCHASE INTEREST
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY DISSOLUTION PROCEEDINGS AND APPOINT APPRAISERS
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT SCHEER
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2021
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Brief - BRIEF REPORT FOR MARCH 24 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BUY OUT)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BUY OUT) OF 03/24/2021
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE BUY OUT)
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference re Buy out) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 30, 2021Court Order on Motion to stay case pending valuation hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Robert Scheer; Filed by: Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Brief Report for March 24 Status Conference; Filed by: Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference re Buy out) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Zuade Kaufman (Defendant); As to: Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Buy out)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Robert Scheer (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert Scheer) Filed by Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Buy out) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Buy out)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Buy out) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (of Election to Purchase Interest) Filed by Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Robert Scheer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Brief (Report for March 24 Status Conference) Filed by Zuade Kaufman (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Court Order on Motion to stay case pending valuation hearing held Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Robert Scheer)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of 03/16/2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Stay Dissolution Proceedings and Appoint Appraisers)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Buy out))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Brief (Report for March 24 Status Conference)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Court Order on Motion to stay case pending valuation hearing held 3/16/21
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/17/2021)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Buy out) of 03/24/2021)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Election to Purchase Interest)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.