Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Charles A. Newman Santa Barbara House Trust, Drown Karen, Elizabeth F. Newman Santa Barbara House Trust, Hernandez Luis Manuel, Lovato Aaron, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Bezek Peter James, Spreter Geoffrey Joseph, Liebman Joseph, Robertson Alexander Iv, against Edison International, Southern California Edison Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Karen Drown (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Drown (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 23, 2023Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Karen Drown (Plaintiff)
Date: May 22, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counse...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Ame...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Karen Drown (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Rye Fire Cases); Status Conference (Rye Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re 17th Petition for Add...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re CMO #7)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Settlement Program Report)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Hearing...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to Anyone Who Has Not Op...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Plaintiff Braun C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re Rye Fire; Status Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to Anyone Who Has Not Op...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend the April 8, 2002 Case M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Settlement Program Report))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Nineteenth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Nineteenth order for coordination of add-on cases
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re 17th Petition for Add...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re Rye Fire; Status Conf...))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Rye Fire Cases); Status Conference (Rye Fi...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Plaintiff Braun C...))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to Anyone Who Has Not Op...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counse...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to Anyone Who Has Not Op...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Nineteenth Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re Rye Fire; Status Conf...))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Status Conference re 17th Petition for Add...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (Rye Fire Cases); Status Conference (Rye Fi...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Settlement Program Report))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counse...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to Anyone Who Has Not Op...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.