Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Molina Fernando, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Orihuela Nicolas, against Del West Engineering Inc., represented by Mansukhani Roger M., Walgampaya Amrita Bimali, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 25, 2020Complaint
Date: November 25, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Fernando Molina (Plaintiff); As to: Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Fernando Molina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Del West Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/18/2020)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 12/31/2020)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.