Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Westlake Services Llc A Limited Liability Company Dba Westlake Financial Services, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Friedman Joshua P, against Onbirback Khosrow, San Jose Auto Outlet Plus Trucks Inc. A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan Bryant-Deason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a summons notifying the defendant that they are being sued by the plaintiff. The defendant is informed that they have 30 calendar days to file a written response at the court and serve a copy on the plaintiff. It is emphasized that ...
Summary of the Case; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC a limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Default Prove Up Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 19, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC a limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 19, 2021Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 19, 2021Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC a limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference and Order to Show Cause re proof of...))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.