Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dr. Allen Lu, Scosi Orthopedics, Kontakt International Inc. A Florida Corporation, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Moss Aaron J., against Dr. Allen Lu, Scosi Orthopedics, Weissman Scott, represented by Bowse Michael, Kasendorf Alexander Samuel, Moss Aaron J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Scott Weissman (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Order re Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Scott Weissman (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION; Filed by: KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for extension of time to serv...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant); DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant); DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Scott Weissman (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Michael Bowse (Attorney)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Order to Show Cause Re: Purs...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER) Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for extension of time to serv...))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Order to Show Cause Re: Purs...))
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for extension of time to serv...))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/16/2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.