Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carpenter By And Through His Successor In Interest Diane Carpenter Lincoln, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Garcia Stephen M, Garcia Stephen Michael, against Citrus Wellness Center Llc, Driftwood Healthcare & Wellness Center Llc, Rechnitz Citrus Gp, Rechnitz Shlomo, Rockport Administrative Services Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Cowdrey Sean D, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2020Complaint
Date: November 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DIANE CARPENTER
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application REQUESTING THE COURT FOR AN ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DIANE CARPENTER)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING THE COURT FOR AN ORDER)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/10/2021)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.300)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.