Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alvarez Rosario, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Block Brandon A, against Santander Consumer Usa Inc. Dba Chrysler Capital, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuart M. Rice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - Peremptory Challenge To Judicial Officer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Santander Consumer USA, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Rosario Alvarez (Plaintiff); As to: Santander Consumer USA, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Peremptory Challenge To Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order - Peremptory Challenge To Judicial Officer) of 12/02/2020)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.