Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Wawrzenski Alexa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Shegerian Carney R., Shegerian Carney Richard, against Mark Peter, Nakasone Marie, Serrano-Cobo Soledad, United, United Airlines, (total of 7) See All represented by Razani Mona Amy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff); As to: United Airlines (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff); As to: United (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees ALEXA WAWRZENSKI; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging UNREDACTED CONFIDENTIAL PLEADINGS; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Objection OBJ TO PROPOSED ORDER (WAWRZENSKI); Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging WAWRZENSKI).FILING COPY ONLY; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Reply RFP3 (WAWRZENSKI); Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Reply SPROGG SET 3 (WAWRZENSKI); Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Order Ruling of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to File Third Amended Complaint (3AC); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 5; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 3; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 14; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice OF COURT ORDER RE MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 2; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Objection PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Reply PLAINTIFFS REPLY ISO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Respondent; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Respondent)
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Appellant)
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 11, 2023Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Objection TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging OF CONFIDENTIAL VIDEO MARKED BY PLAINTIFF; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 4; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Objection TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 7; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 1; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 8; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 6; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS, vol 3 Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to File Third Amended Complaint (3AC) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Objection (TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 14) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 8) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 7) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Judgment (for Defendant United Airlines, Inc.) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Order (Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial, without prejudice)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel by Deft United Airlines, Inc. to ...))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by De...))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Order (ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING REQUEST FOR CELL PHONE AND BILLING RECORDS AND DISMISSAL OF CLAIM)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order by Deft United Airline...))
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Order (Ruling of )
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Deft United Airlines, Inc....))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS, vol 1 Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING ENTITY DEFENDANTS) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Wawrzenski - Stip re SAC.Rs Final (003)) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel by Deft United Airlines, Inc. to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice (Regarding Hearing Date) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Unredacted Confidential Pleadings) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling (of Deft's Motion to Compel Further Responses) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Objection (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial, without prejudice) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Grant the Par...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Order (ORDER TO FINAL JOINT STIP RE ENTITY DEF (WAWRZENSKI)) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order by Deft United Airline...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING COMPLETE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF CONFIDENTIAL VIDEO MARKED BY PLAINTIFF) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Deft United Airlines, Inc....)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS VOL 2 Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Order (Ruling of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Objection (TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE) Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alexa Wawrzenski (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Grant the Par...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Partial, without prejudice)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Wawrzenski - Stip re SAC.Rs Final (003))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING ENTITY DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order (ORDER TO FINAL JOINT STIP RE ENTITY DEF (WAWRZENSKI))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Order (ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING REQUEST FOR CELL PHONE AND BILLING RECORDS AND DISMISSAL OF CLAIM)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling (of Deft's Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel by Deft United Airlines, Inc. to ...))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by De...))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Unredacted Confidential Pleadings)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions by Deft United Ai...))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (REGARDING HEARING DATE)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Notice (TO DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE WITNESSES AT TRIAL (C.C.P. 1987(b)))
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses by Pl...))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (REGARDING ENTITY DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Unredacted Confidential Pleadings)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Grant the Par...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling (of Deft's Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Wawrzenski - Stip re SAC.Rs Final (003))
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff to Continue Defe...))
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Order (ORDER TO FINAL JOINT STIP RE ENTITY DEF (WAWRZENSKI))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (Regarding Hearing Date)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.