Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Richards Felisa Dee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bowen William Dalebout, Bowen William D. Esq., against Affinia Default Services Llc A Florida Limited Liability Company, Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-G A Delaware Statutory Trust, Gregory Funding Llc An Oregon Limited Liability Company, Paladar Capital Investments Lp A California Based Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. A National Banking Association, (total of 5) See All represented by Dineen John, Dineen John C. Esq., Freeling Melissa A., Mase Andrew, Mase Andrew Jonathan, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert Broadbelt III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Broadbelt III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Paladar Capital Investments, LP a California based Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Order re: Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Defendant Paladar Capital Investments; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Paladar Capital Investments, LP a California based Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application temporary restraining order; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Paladar Capital Investments, LP a California based Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Declaration of William D. Bowen; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Defendant P...)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Order re: Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: September 07, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Temporary Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: removal to federal court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Complaint;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Order (re Demurrer to First Amended Complaint (of Gregory, Wells Fargo and Paladar)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Paladar Capital Investments, LP a California based Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (temporary restraining order) Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gregory Funding LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Gregory Funding LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Defendant P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Gregory Funding LLC, an Oregon limited liability company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Order (re: Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Defendant Paladar Capital Investments) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a national banking association (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Paladar Capital Investments, LP a California based Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (of William D. Bowen) Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Shorten Time ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Felisa Dee Richards (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Demurrer, Case Management Conference and OSC)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: removal to federal court))
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Status Conference)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of CMC, OSC and Demurrer)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Temporary Re...))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE REQUEST)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE UNDER CCP ¿430.41 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens;)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Declaration (of William D. Bowen)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens (filed by Defendant Paladar Capital Investments on 05-12-2022;)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (temporary restraining order)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Complaint;) of )
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Complaint;))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00JOINT STIPULATION RE DEADLINE TO RESPOND OF GREGORY FUNDING, LLC AND AJAX MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2018-G
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF FELISA DEE RICHARDS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (of William D. Bowen)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (temporary restraining order)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Temporary Re...))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Monetary Status to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/03/2021)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/23/2021)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF FELISA DEE RICHARDS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2021)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of CMC, OSC and Demurrer)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE REQUEST)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Demurrer, Case Management Conference and OSC)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE UNDER CCP ¿430.41 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/17/2021)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.