Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anderson Michela Leslie, Andre Daniella, California Family Farms Llc, Clasby Kerry, Holst Jens, (total of 13) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Blum Steven Aaron, Collins Craig Michael, Lee Timothy Raymond, Whalen Daniel Charles, against Edison International, Southern California Edison Company, represented by Hueston John Charles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Albert Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Shawn Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Dallas Rutherford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Rr. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Albert Stern (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Patricia Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Albert Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Shawn Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Albert Stern (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY BRIAN R. STRAN...)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rr. Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Albert Stern (Plaintiff); Patricia Stern (Plaintiff); Shawn Stern (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why the St...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other to Allow...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel all attys for Str...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Hearing...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Further Status Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference under Code of Civil Pr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Without Prejudice)) Filed by Dallas Rutherford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other of Bakla...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Stay Discovery; Order...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Stay on Discovery Should Not ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other unoppose...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Rr. Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the clai...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Receipt of Less Redacted Cal Fire ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Dallas Rutherford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other to Conti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute [21SMCV01768]; F...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Stay Discovery; Heari...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Brian R. Stran...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Ediso...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re Participating in MSC)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Rr. Complex Determination;) of 11/25/2020)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rr. Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Twenty-Third Petition for Coordination)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Further Status Confer...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order RE: Twenty-Third Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference under Code of Civil Pr...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Stay Discovery; Heari...))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial and Stay Discovery; Order...))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Receipt of Less Redacted Cal Fire ...))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other to Conti...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the clai...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re Participating in MSC))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ...))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other unoppose...))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal ((Without Prejudice))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other to Allow...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Ediso...))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...): Status Date changed from to | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...) | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Further Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
August 18, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 10 Further Status Conference - Held Further Status Conference - Held |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.