Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tsai Chunyen C., Tsai Jeffrey C., Wong Hua Yen Chen, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Hsu Roger C., against Liu Joanne, represented by Li Hong, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Joanne Liu (Defendant); As to: Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Joanne Liu (Defendant); As to: Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Summary Judgment: Filed By: Joanne Liu (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Joanne Liu (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Jeffrey C. Tsai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition; Filed by: Joanne Liu (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Jud...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/04/2021)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.