Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Scutti Thomas, against Ayrapetian Vladimir, Malkhasyan Arevik, Malkhasyan Petros, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company against defendants Vladimir Ayrapetian, Petros Malkhasyan, Arevik Malkhasyan, and Does 1-30. State Farm is a corporation licensed to do business as an automobile liability insu...
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Vladimir)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff State Farm's Notice of Case Management Conference (& POS)_2021.05.28)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Order for Publication (for VLADIMIR)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Code of Civil P...))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/12/2021)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.