Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
One Vine Group Llc, Vine Corner Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cohen David M, against Rodriguez Oliver V., represented by Shackelford Joel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint, filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, is between Oliver V. Rodriguez and DOES 1 t...
Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Court Order for Demurrer hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Oliver V. Rodriguez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Oliver V. Rodriguez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Oliver V. Rodriguez (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Reply (Reply of defendant, Oliver Rodriguez, to Opposition of Plaintiffs to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.