Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Husband Walter, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bloch William W., Bloch William Wilkes, against City Of Los Angeles A Government Entity Of The State Of California, represented by Jacobe Maetha, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management38 days |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Walter Husband (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 11/18/2020)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Case 19STCV06658))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 01/14/2021)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff Walter Husband's Notice of Related Case)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/18/2020)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATED CASE 19STCV06658)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 01/26/2021)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.