Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leyton William, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Suzuki Kazuo, represented by Mcgirr Bradley J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Thomas D. Long presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D. Long Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant); As to: William Leyton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff); As to: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00First Amended Complaint; Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff); As to: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff); As to: Kazuo Suzuki (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: William Leyton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Court Unavailable and Rescheduling Motion Hear...))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.