Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Casasola Jason, Edwards Shawnqa, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lavi Daniel, against Apartment Management Group Llc, Apartment Management Group Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Chloe?S Apartments Llc, Chloe'S Apartments Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Crystal Management Inc, (total of 12) See All represented by Carpenter Gregory J., Schiller Matthew Aaron, Van Wagner Shanna Marie, Demason Michelle R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enforce; Filed by: Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Order re Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: APARTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, (Defendant); CHLOE’S APARTMENTS, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Order re Defendants' Motion to Compel Deposition; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Gaylord Williams (Defendant); Eloise Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (re Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Enforce) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jason Casasola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (AND SERVICE OF PROCESS EMAIL ADDRESS)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT DECLARATION OF GREGORY J. CARPENTER)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Motion to Enforce)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
March 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
October 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATES AND/OR ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case numbers 20STCV42255, and 22STCV00005 consolidated; case number 20STCV42255 is the lead case. | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | On the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.