Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles Unified School District, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Andrade Sean A., Capell David Christian, Piazza Anthony J., Whitford Mark T. Jr., against Allied World National Assurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Insurance Company Of The State Of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity And Liability Company, (total of 5) See All represented by Capell David, Capell David Christian, Piazza Anthony J., Whitford Mark T. Jr., Doren Richard J., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Allied World National Assurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Message Board Posting Setting of 3/28; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Service; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Allied World National Assurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Order Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice RE July 13, 2021 Status Conference; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Order Case Anywhere; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Message Board Posting re: Setting 11/29; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 10, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: November 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (JOINDER)
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 01, 2020Response - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION
Date: December 21, 2020Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES
Date: December 21, 2020Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2020Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)
Date: January 13, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF COMPLEX FEES BY DEFENDANT STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Date: January 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF COMPLEX FEES BY DEFENDANT EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 21, 2021Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 25, 2021Answer
Date: January 28, 2021Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2021Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF THE FEBRUARY 9, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE
Date: February 05, 2021Order - ORDER CASE ANYWHERE
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND SERVICE LIST
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 04, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 08, 2021Other - - JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF THE APRIL 16, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 01, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 08, 2021Joint Status Conference Report
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE RE JULY 13, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 31, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 24, 2021Exhibit List
Date: September 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 17, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 17, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ETC...
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL CASES))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL CASES))
Date: August 25, 2022Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: SETTING 11/29
Date: August 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL CASES))
Date: October 07, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: December 05, 2022Response - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: December 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL CASES))
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 19, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: December 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL CASES))
Date: January 11, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE 170.6)
Date: January 30, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: January 30, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 01, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. SEVERANCE DETERMINATION;)
Date: February 01, 2023Notice - NOTICE RE FEBRUARY 1, 2023 MINUTE ORDER
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL RELATED MATTERS))
Date: April 12, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 12, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Mark T. Whitford, Jr. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate (of Service) Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 04, 2020Complaint
Date: November 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF COURT’S ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: December 14, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Anthony J. Piazza (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Allied World National Assurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (Via Case Anywhere) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Order (Case Anywhere) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling Changes)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Severance Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge 170.6)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Message Board Posting (re: Setting 11/29) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases); Hearing on Motion for ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Allied World National Assurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Notice (Re February 1, 2023 Minute Order) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Ruling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter re: Plaintiff Los Angeles Unified ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Cross-Motion) of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company's Answer to Complaint
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice Of Service Of Order Authorizing Electronic Service and Service List
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ? UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objection to Order Re Non-Complex Determination
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Joint Status report in advance of the April 16, 2021 Status Conference
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice (Re: June 1, 2021 Status Conference (Cahuenga and Franklin Coverage Actions))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Joint Status Report For Cahuenga And Franklin Actions In Advance Of The June 1, 2021 Status Conference
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Alexander Joko CSR# 12272)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Certificate (of Service)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Joint Status Report in advance of the February 9, 2021 Status Conference
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Objection (to Order Re Non-Complex Determination)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF COURT?S ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet ((Joinder))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (RE July 13, 2021 Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice Of Deposit Of Complex Fees By Defendant Everest National Insurance Company
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Cross-Motion) of ...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Joint Status Report for Cahuenga and Franklin Actions in Advance of the March 7, 2022 Status Conference
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Payment of Annual Renewal Pro Hac Vice Fees for Mark T. Whitford, Jr. and Anthony J. Piazza)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling Changes))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (Via Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Status Report (for Cahuenga and Franklin Actions in Advance of the October 5, 2021 Status Conference)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Joint Status Report for Cahuenga and Franklin Actions in Advance of the March 7, 2022 Status Conference
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Clerk's Declaration re: Search and Order to Deem Copy as Original
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference (All Cases); Hearing on Motion for ...))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet ((Joinder))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 11/24/2020)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ? UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF COURT?S ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S NOTICE OF ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Objection (to Order Re Non-Complex Determination)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Response (PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate (of Service)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (Re: June 1, 2021 Status Conference (Cahuenga and Franklin Coverage Actions))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice (RE July 13, 2021 Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Alexander Joko CSR# 12272)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Status Report (for Cahuenga and Franklin Actions in Advance of the October 5, 2021 Status Conference)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (Via Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Cross-Motion) of ...))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Payment of Annual Renewal Pro Hac Vice Fees for Mark T. Whitford, Jr. and Anthony J. Piazza)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Scheduling Changes))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Defendant Allied World Assurance Company's Notice Of Appearance
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) Filed by Mark T. Whitford, Jr. (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (RE July 13, 2021 Status Conference) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT?S NOTICE OF ORDER RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Order (Order Granting Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.