Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Demurjian Chia Yee, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Shegerian Carney R., Shegerian Carney Richard, against Coleman Lori, Community Convalescent Center Of Montclair Inc., Garcia Maria, Gardens Of El Monte Llc, Mandelbaum Simcha, (total of 9) See All represented by Lee Janette Christine, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: November 03, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL MTC PMK.(DEMURJIAN)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Deposition; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of CMC; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Ruling Re Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of CMC) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice (WITHDRAWAL MTC PMK.(DEMURJIAN)) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Compel Deposition) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ruling Re Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Order to Show Cause ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: January 03, 2022Notice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL.(DEMURJIAN)) Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Chia Yee Demurjian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (PROTECTIVE ? CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice (OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (of CMC)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (WITHDRAWAL MTC PMK.(DEMURJIAN))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Response (DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF KERRI R. LUTFEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? OBJECTIONS TO IMPERMISSIBLE NEW EVIDENCE)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ruling Re Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANT?S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/16/2021)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.