Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Creighton Ben Aka Ben V Creighton, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: BEN CREIGHTON (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 25, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference) of 02/05/2021)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.