Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Chung Jang Geun, The Oriental Mission Church, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Kim Howard Byung, against Kim Chi Hoon, Kim Kwang Chan, Park In Chan, represented by Shrenger Justin Jay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with David J. Cowan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid J. Cowan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Brief [Supplemental] re Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Objection to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: THE ORIENTAL MISSION CHURCH (Plaintiff); JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration of Sung Ki Lee Resubmission; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration of Jang Geun Chung; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order re objections to declaration of Lee; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Declaration of Jang Geun Chung; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order re objections to declaration of Chung; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration of Eun Joo Lee; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Objection to Declaration of Daeseung Son; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order Denying Motion For A Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Reply re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Objection Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of In Chan Park; Filed by: IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order - ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Lee) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Chung) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion For A Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTIAL MISSION CHUR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTAL MISSION CHURC...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant); KWANG CHAN KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of In Chan Park) Filed by IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant); KWANG CHAN KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Judgment Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant); KWANG CHAN KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (contained in the Ex Parte Appli...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Appointment of Provisional D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Appointment of Provisional Director...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by The Oriental Mission Church (Plaintiff); JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by The Oriental Mission Church (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by The Oriental Mission Church (Plaintiff); JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by The Oriental Mission Church (Plaintiff); JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by THE ORIENTAL MISSION CHURCH (Plaintiff); JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Sung Ki Lee Resubmission) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Reply (re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Eun Joo Lee) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by CHI HOON KIM (Defendant); IN CHAN PARK (Defendant); KWANG CHAN KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Brief ([Supplemental] re Preliminary Injunction) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Daeseung Son) Filed by JANG GEUN CHUNG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Chi Hoon Kim, In Chan Park, and Kwang C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFFS? SUPPMENTAL BRIEF RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE TO CONTINUE DATE TO FILE OPPOSITION AND OF HEARING DATE ON OSC)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON OSC; ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF IN CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF REV. CHI HOON KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KWANG CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of In Chan Park)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Sung Ki Lee In Support of Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Reply (re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KWANG CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN O...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF REV. CHI HOON KIM IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF EUN JOO LEE)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAESEUNG SON IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTAL MISSION CHURC...))
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for temporary restraining order and order to show cause re preliminary injunction)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTIAL MISSION CHUR...))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Chung)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Lee)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Eun Joo Lee)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAESEUNG SON IN OPPOSITION TO OSC RE: ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Brief ([Supplemental] re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Reply (re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Daeseung Son)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Sung Ki Lee Resubmission)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion For A Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Chi Hoon Kim, In Chan Park, and Kwang C...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Demurrers to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Defendants Chi Hoon Kim, In Chan Park, and Kwang C...) of )
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Eun Joo Lee)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...) of )
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF EUN JOO LEE)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF HOWARD B. KIM)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion re: (for an order appointing a provisional director)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER ...))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO DETERMINE THE VALIDITY OF ELECTION OR APPOINTMENT OF DIRECTORS)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF AEJA LIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF ELECTION)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Jang Geun Chung re Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Appointment of Provisional D...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of In Chan Park)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Objection (TO INACCURATE NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Howard B. Kim re Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (contained in the Ex Parte Appli...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Appointment of Provisional Director...))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases) of )
Date: April 05, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case) of )
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Cases))
Date: April 05, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFFS? SUPPMENTAL BRIEF RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE TO CONTINUE DATE TO FILE OPPOSITION AND OF HEARING DATE ON OSC)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Res...))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON OSC; ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/20/2020)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF REV. CHI HOON KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KWANG CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF IN CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO OSC)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of In Chan Park)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Reply (re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN O...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Sung Ki Lee In Support of Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF EUN JOO LEE)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF REV. CHI HOON KIM IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAESEUNG SON IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KWANG CHAN KIM IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTIAL MISSION CHUR...))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Lee)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Order (re objections to declaration of Chung)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for temporary restraining order and order to show cause re preliminary injunction)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Brief ([Supplemental] re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, THE ORIENTAL MISSION CHURC...))
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Sung Ki Lee Resubmission)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Eun Joo Lee)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DAESEUNG SON IN OPPOSITION TO OSC RE: ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Kwang Chan Kim)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Daeseung Son)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Reply (re Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Chi Hoon Kim)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion For A Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Demurrers to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants Chi Hoon Kim, In Chan Park, and Kwang C...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Objection (to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Eun Joo Lee)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF JANG GEUN CHUNG)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jang Geun Chung)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF HOWARD B. KIM)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF EUN JOO LEE)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion re: (for an order appointing a provisional director)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER ...))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR (1) AN ORDER TO DISMISS T...))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF AEJA LIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF ELECTION)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO DETERMINE THE VALIDITY OF ELECTION OR APPOINTMENT OF DIRECTORS)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of In Chan Park)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Jang Geun Chung re Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Howard B. Kim re Motion to Appoint Provisional Director)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Appointment of Provisional D...))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROVISIONAL DIRECTOR)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (contained in the Ex Parte Appli...))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Objection (TO INACCURATE NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Appointment of Provisional Director...))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case) of 02/17/2022)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/13/2021)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re to Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.