Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jaisinghani Gul, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Damico Nicholas Luciano, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S Of London, Crc Insurance Services Inc., represented by Hansen Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Court's Order for Motion for Summary Judgment hearing held on ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Mediation Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Reply (Combined Reply in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Filed in Response to the Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Reply (to Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudicatio)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Declaration (of James Robertson in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator) of )
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of )
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Doru Botic in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF LISA KRALIK HANSEN FOR POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Related Dates)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Tony Carlos in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (of James Bruce in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Three)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Motion re: (for Order Deeming Requests for Admission, Set Two, Admitted)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert Lee in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Rel...))
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Mediation Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 02/03/2021)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Related Dates)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Reply (Combined Reply in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Filed in Response to the Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Mediation Status Conference) of 10/06/2021)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator) of 03/26/2021)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF LISA KRALIK HANSEN FOR POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.