Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blackwell Elizabeth A, Blackwell Thomas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cooper Randi, Egbase Gerald O., against Borrego Gerardo Co-Trustees Of A.J. Williams T.A.B. 1997 Trust, Reeder Jon As Trustee Or Successor Of Jon Reeder Separate Property Trust, Williams Charles P Co-Trustees Of A.J. Williams T.A.B. 1997 Trust, represented by Keeler William Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Status Conference Report; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: November 02, 2020Complaint
Date: November 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/09/2020
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 23, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 15, 2021Answer
Date: March 17, 2021Answer
Date: April 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: May 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 03, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 18, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 23, 2021Status Report
Date: January 06, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2022
Date: January 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 25, 2022Status Conference Report
Date: May 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: July 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: September 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference Re: Arbitration) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jon Reeder,, as Trustee, or Successor of Jon Reeder Separate Property Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Appointing A Neutr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order) Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Appointing A Neutr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Status Conference Report Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Arbitration) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: September 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Thomas Blackwell (Plaintiff); Elizabeth A Blackwell (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Appointing A Neutr...))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Counsel In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Counsel Gerald Egbase, In Support Of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Plaintiff In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/09/2020)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/03/2021)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.