Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Safeco Insurance Company Of America A Corporation, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Haines Todd F., against Mekhitarian Hasmik A., represented by Giudice-Hu Carla, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: July 28, 2022Case Management Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America, a corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: HASMIK A. MEKHITARIAN (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 30, 2020Complaint
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 24, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: November 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 30, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 10, 2021Answer
Date: March 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2021Case Management Order
Date: April 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: March 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 20, 2022Motion to Consolidate
Date: July 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.