Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fong June Yuen Fka Chew Yune Fong, Lam Chun Wing, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Ip Edward C. Esq., against The Estate Of Fred Bing Fong, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration (of Edward C. Ip in Support of the Application for Service by Publication)
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Request for Interpreter; Filed by: Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Interpreter Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Jury Trial) Filed by Chun Wing Lam (Plaintiff); June Yuen Fong (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Jury Trial)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF CHUN WING LAM IN SUPPORT OF ACTION TO QUIET TITLE (ADVERSE POSSESSION))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Request for Interpreter
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Order for Publication (for The Estate of Fred Bing Fong)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.