Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
John Doe N.W., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Goldberg Arthur L., against Defendant Doe 1, Defendant Doe 2, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cunningham, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: John Doe N.W. (Plaintiff); As to: Defendant Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: John Doe N.W. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Adoption Form of Master Complaint; Filed by: John Doe N.W. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe N.W. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of 02/02/2021)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings) of 02/24/2021)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 11/10/2020)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference) of 01/15/2021)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Adoption Form of Master Complaint
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Order (to Amend Complaint to Substitute the Name of the Defendants for the Fictitious Designation)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of defendant, Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference) | |
August 21, 2023 | Hearing | Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02:30 PM | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference - Held - Continued Further Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
August 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
August 03, 2023 | Hearing |
Initial Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: David S. Cunningham, III |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Further Status Conference Re: Bellwether Deposition Protocol) | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 11 Further Status Conference (ReBellwether Deposition Protocol) - Held Further Status Conference (ReBellwether Deposition Protocol) - Held Judge: David S. Cunningham, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.