Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Scott Zhelinrentic Levels, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Rahmani Neama, against Evvemi Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: October 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 21, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Assignment) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service ; OS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiffs' Failure to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: June 08, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Evvemi, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: June 08, 2021Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference ***Reassigned from dpt. 12 on 12/1...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Zhelinrentic Levels Scott (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Case Assignment)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 11/23/2020)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 12/14/2020)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference ***Reassigned from dpt. 12 on 12/1...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Non-Service)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service ; OS...))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiffs' Failure to ...))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.