Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vega Ruben, Vega Trindia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sirmabekian Sarkis, against Malibu Canyon Village Owners Association Inc., Ross Morgan & Company Inc., represented by Wattles Kevin S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Complaint Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by RUBEN VEGA (Plaintiff); TRINDIA VEGA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (RUBEN VEGA and TRINDIA VEGA)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.