Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mcmullen Willie F Jr., Welch Deanna, filed a(n) Civil case against Hdsi Management, Hdsi Management A California Corporation, Walton Halad Company Two Llc, Walton Halad Company Two Llc A Limited Liability Company, represented by Brouses Bernadette Castillo, Gordon Eli A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Objection to Declaration of Benjamin Reccius; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order re evidentiary objections re ex parte notice; Filed by:
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Order Ruling of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by:
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Order Re::Defendants" Special Motion to Strike Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff); Deanna Welch (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Deanna Welch (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff); Deanna Welch (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Order re ex parte application; Filed by:
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HDSI Management (Defendant); Walton Halad Company Two, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants motion for attorney fees; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HDSI Management (Defendant); Walton Halad Company Two, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Objection Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Reccius; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order re: Defendants' Motion for Award of Mandatory Attorney's Fees and Costs CCP 425.16(c); Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Declaration for Order; Filed by: HDSI Management (Defendant); Walton Halad Company Two, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: HDSI Management (Defendant); Walton Halad Company Two, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Declaration of Connie Loyola; Filed by: Willie F McMullen, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Order Order Re Plaintiffs ExParte Application For Order Shortening Time; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defts for an Order Advanci...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Benjamin Reccius)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX Parte Application for an Order advancing the hearing date)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF NOEL SWEITZER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Shortening Time and Advancing...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF BENJAMIN S. RECCIUS RE: MEET AND CONFER ON MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF GARY ARAKELIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Order (Re::Defendants" Special Motion to Strike Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: whether parties will be ordered to MSC))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice (JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Order (Ruling of )
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice ([REVISED] JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Lodgment)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX Parte Application for an Order advancing the hearing date)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (RE: Demurrer and in support of extending time to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 12/01/2020)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANA WARD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF NOEL SWEITZER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Benjamin Reccius)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Shortening Time and Advancing...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANA WARD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Connie Loyola)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Reccius, Ward, and Request for Judicial Notice, Ward)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs? Opposition To Defendants? Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Benjamin S. Reccius)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint; Hearing on...))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP ¿ 425.16])
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order (Ruling of 4/6/21)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Lodgment)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Appearance of Plaintiff Deanna Welch)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice ([REVISED] JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants motion for attorney fees)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Order (Re::Defendants" Special Motion to Strike Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Reccius)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Defts for an Order Advanci...))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/01/2020)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Reccius, Ward, and Request for Judicial Notice, Ward)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANA WARD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (RE: Demurrer and in support of extending time to file responsive pleading)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP ¿ 425.16])
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Advancing Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Reccius)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Case Management...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (for Order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin S. Reccius Re: Meet and Confer on Motion to Strike Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANA WARD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S.RECCIUS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint; Hearing on...))
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Connie Loyola)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Order (Order Re Plaintiffs ExParte Application For Order Shortening Time)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs? Opposition To Defendants? Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Declaration of Benjamin S. Reccius)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Appearance of Plaintiff Deanna Welch)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin S. Reccius Re: Meet and Confer on Motion to Strike Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF BENJAMIN S. RECCIUS RE: MEET AND CONFER ON MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (for Order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the He...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF GARY ARAKELIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CCP 425.16])
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Order (Order Re Plaintiffs ExParte Application For Order Shortening Time)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Case Management...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S.RECCIUS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.