Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Batun Ofelia, Holiday #101A Limited Partnership, Holiday #101A Limited Partnership A California Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Greenberg Marc Richard Esq., Lake David Nathan, Workman Douglas J., Hartman Roger Charles, against Castillo Maria, Gutierrez Ofelia, represented by Bramzon Daniel Jay, Hermansen Kevin, Chiroux Matthis Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Battery, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ofelia Batun Erroneously Sued As OFELIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ofelia Batun Erroneously Sued As OFELIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Ofelia Batun Erroneously Sued As OFELIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Opposition to Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Ofelia Batun (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Declaration of Defendant/Cross-Complainant; Filed by: Ofelia Batun (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney AMENDED; Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Ofelia Batun Erroneously Sued As OFELIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: HOLIDAY #101A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT?S ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Referral of Personal Injury (...) of )
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Referral of Personal Injury (...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of )
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Plaintiff Holiday #101A Limited Partnership?s...) of )
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling and Orders Issued at Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge against the H...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND VACATING OF DATES)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Plaintiff Holiday #101A Limited Partnership?s...))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ENTERING PLAINTI...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Answer (Second Amended answer)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge against the H...) of )
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Opposition ([Amended] to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Matthis Chiroux, Esq.)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Cross Defendants Demurrer to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Defendant/Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT?S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Referral of Personal Injury (...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support Of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/13/2021)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge against the H...))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER ENTERING PLAINTI...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND VACATING OF DATES)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT?S ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Plaintiff Holiday #101A Limited Partnership?s...))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)])
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling and Orders Issued at Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Answer (Second Amended answer)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Opposition ([Amended] to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO DEFENDANT?S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
July 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
May 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Post-Mediation Status Conference |
|
October 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Judge: Stephanie M. Bowick |
|
November 28, 2022 | Hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 19, Stephanie M. Bowick, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Stephanie M. Bowick |
|
November 28, 2022 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.