Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nabeel Muhammad Umair, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Khaled Khaled Mohammed, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArmen Tamzarian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Muhammad Umair Nabeel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Muhammad Umair Nabeel (Plaintiff); As to: Khaled Mohammed Khaled (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Muhammad Umair Nabeel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Muhammad Umair Nabeel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Muhammad Umair Nabeel (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (requesting assistance in serving the defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of )
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...) of )
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; C...))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration of Notice (requesting assistance in serving the defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.