Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Curry Mikisha, Matern Law Group Pc, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kirnosova Irina A., Larsen Neil, against Lakewood Healthcare And Wellness Centre Lp, represented by Chu Selwyn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Wilson Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Wilson Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: October 16, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff); Matern Law Group, PC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: January 27, 2023Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff); Matern Law Group, PC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff); Matern Law Group, PC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration of Irina Kirnosova in Support of Motion To Compel; Filed by: Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation and Order to Conti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Irina Kirnosova in Support of Motion To Compel) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration of Individual Paga Cl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lakewood Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: January 27, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mikisha Curry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/26/2020)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.