Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Schultz Abigael K, Schultz Gregory J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andaya Cesar, Mnatsakanian Narek, against Ciccotti William J, Quanta Utility Engineering Services Inc., represented by Enyart Dana Marie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Audra M. Mori presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAudra M. Mori Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death - Uninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Abigael K Schultz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Quanta Utility Engineering Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gregory J Schultz (Plaintiff); Abigael K Schultz (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Plaintiffs' D...))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.