Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
White Tamyra, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kashima Trenton Ross, Stoops Kevin J., against Vxi Global Solutions Llc, represented by Reathaford Laura, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy D. Hogue Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 13, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Ruling; Filed by: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Joint Initial Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on related Case; Filed by: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $100.00 Dollars Against ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Tamyra White (Plaintiff); As to: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Joint Initial Case Management Statement Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on related Case Filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: January 03, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Tamyra White (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review /Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by VXI Global Solutions, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Initial Status Conference Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (VXI Global solutions, LLC)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/16/2020)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/05/2020, Initial Status Conference Order)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on related Case
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions of $100.00 Dollars Against ...))
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Order to Show Cause Regarding Imposition of Sanctions
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Joint Initial Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.