Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Caldas Jaime, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna, against General Motors Llc, represented by Major Cameron, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Keosian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jaime Caldas (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Jaime Caldas (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jaime Caldas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Jaime Caldas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jaime Caldas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/26/2020)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.