Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bratsby-Rudd Cori, Jones Kelsey, Munoz Zoe, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gaines Daniel F., Tojarieh Joseph, against Giggans Patricia O., Peace Over Violence, represented by Amundson Steven C., Dong Marcus, Sookasian Alina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Reassignment of Case;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Peace Over Violence (Defendant); Patricia O. Giggans (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Service; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Peace Over Violence (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Order Initial Status Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Peace Over Violence (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Initial Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Daniel F. Gaines (Attorney)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Peace Over Violence (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Kelsey Jones (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 27, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Patricia O. Giggans (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Peace Over Violence (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of )
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Reassignment of Case;))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Order Re Joint Stipulation to Continue
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Reassignment of Case;) of )
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Service)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Joint Stipulation to Continue
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Reassignment of Case;) of 10/22/2020)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 10/21/2020)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Reassignment of Case;))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of 10/22/2021)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of 01/28/2021)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of 09/07/2021)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Initial Status Conference) of 05/05/2021)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/17/2020)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.