Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Magana Medrano Francisco, Reyes Jonathan Steve, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve, against 5905 Ahk Llc A California Limited Liability Company Dba Keyes Chevrolet, General Motos Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Flores Marlene Kristen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maureen Duffy-Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen Duffy-Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 09, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: October 09, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by JONATHAN STEVE REYES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by FRANCISCO MAGANA MEDRANO (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEVE REYES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by GENERAL MOTOS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: GENERAL MOTOS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by GENERAL MOTOS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by FRANCISCO MAGANA MEDRANO (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEVE REYES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by FRANCISCO MAGANA MEDRANO (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEVE REYES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.