Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mendez Mari, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Regala Dr. Began, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 09, 2020Complaint
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 09, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 21, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (PLAINTIFF SELF REPRE...))
Date: December 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: November 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service ((PO...))
Date: January 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.