Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Jaime, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kohen Isaac, against Fca Us Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Los Angeles Motor Cars Inc A California Corporation Dba Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep, represented by Hanson Erin, Nys Mark Hubert, Kizirian Eric, Webb Jeremiah Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Clerk; Judge Name: Barbra M. Scheper
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: October 13, 2020Complaint
Date: October 07, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 07, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 19, 2020Answer
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 28, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2020Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT FCA US LLC’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2021Answer
Date: February 09, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 20, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: January 26, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: July 28, 2022Summons (on Complaint) Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: July 28, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by LOS ANGELES MOTOR CARS INC a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT FCA US LLC?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.