Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendoza Mogollon Lilia, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Chiu Sylvia, Moralyan Emma, against Barajas Luis M, Fausto Duran, Fausto Susana, Maya Eva, Sadeghi Janet, (total of 6) See All represented by Pemstein Jason M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Fahey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: REZA SADEGHI (Defendant); JANET SADEGHI (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Re-Assigning Case; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: DURAN FAUSTO (Defendant); SUSANA FAUSTO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Order Denying Further Trial Continuance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re-Assigning Case) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by REZA SADEGHI (Defendant); JANET SADEGHI (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by REZA SADEGHI (Defendant); JANET SADEGHI (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Order Denying Further Trial Continuance Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation of the Parties for Additional Time...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Further Discover...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Settlement Options/Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: October 05, 2021Notice (of Reservation of Right to Seek Punitive Damages) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by LILIA MENDOZA MOGOLLON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re-Assigning Case)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 10/13/2020)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Settlement Options/Discovery))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF JANET SADEGHI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS: DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS L. DAY)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DOUGLAS L. DAY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Further Discover...))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Orders re Amendments to Complaint (Incorrect Names))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Reservation of Right to Seek Punitive Damages)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF SUSANA DURAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation of the Parties for Additional Time...))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/20/2021)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Order Denying Further Trial Continuance
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/01/2021)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.