Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Individuals 31 011, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Custis Keith, against Intuit Consumer Group Llc, Intuit Inc., represented by Cole Rodger Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Order re Court's Order on Ex Parte Application hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Ex Parte Application hearing held ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by 31,011 Individuals (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 10/08/2020)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O...))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Ex Parte Application hearing held 10/20/20)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF WARREN POSTMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/08/2020)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Terry Green |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Terry Green |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Terry Green |
|
December 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Case Management Conference |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Judge: Terry Green |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Terry Green |
|
November 02, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
November 02, 2020 | Hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case numbers 20STCV22761, and 20STCV37714 consolidated; case number 20STCV22761 is the lead case. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.