Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gonzalez Laura, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Gomez Jessica Patrice, Younessi Ramin R., against Baronhr Hospitality Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Baronhr West Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Divine Hotels Group A California Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Salvin Rachel, Welch Eric, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BARONHR WEST, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 31, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 11, 2023Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: LAURA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-05-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2020Complaint
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 29, 2021Answer
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 17, 2021Answer
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 05, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 11, 2...)
Date: December 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 16, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 03, 2023Joint Status Conference Report
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: March 01, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 07, 2023Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: March 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: March 22, 2023Judgment
Date: May 04, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 11, 2...))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.