Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zambrano Jaime, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kluft Stuart Harris, Turner Daniel John, Vanvleck Brian Frederick, against Assa Abloy Entrance Systems U.S. Inc., represented by Chemers Alexander Miller, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jaime Zambrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration of Amber Mariscal; Filed by: Jaime Zambrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Assa Abloy Entrance Systems U.S. Inc. (Defendant)
Date: June 15, 2023Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jaime Zambrano (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 24, 2020Initial Status Conference Order
Date: October 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ASSA ABLOY ENTRANCE SYSTEMS US INC.
Date: November 03, 2020Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 09, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 12, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: May 03, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMBER MARISCAL
Date: May 05, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 05, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 20, 2022Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR PERMISSION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT; ORDER
Date: November 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF JAIME ZAMBRANO'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY ...)
Date: December 07, 2022Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL
Date: December 07, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: April 24, 2023Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Appearance by Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc.
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Appearance by Assa Abloy Entrance Systems US Inc.
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.