Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Farias De Solano Alma Rosa, Gastelum-Campista Josue Ricardo, Gonzalez Maritza, Heard Jr Ronnie, Hooper Deyanira, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Carnes Robert, Hillenbrand Edward Shelton, Holscher Mark C., Mcguire Kyle Brent, Rubcich Kaitlyn Marie, (total of 8) See All against Beutner Austin, Los Angeles Unified School District, represented by Evans Sue Ann Salmon, Plank Michael, Wu Ellen C., Yeomans Keith A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvette M. Palazuelos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management25 days |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2020 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of Michael E. Plank; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: March 11, 2024Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference;) of , Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order Initial Status Conference; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Ruling/Orders (Addendum); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Name Change; Filed by: Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration Of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Declaration of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Meet and Confer; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration Of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00UTLA's Request to Take Judicial Notice; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Rulings/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof Of Service; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA: B315814; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Utla's Costs; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-02-09T00:00:00RULINGS/ORDERS RE: REMITTITUR; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-02-09T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA's Motion for Stay; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Court's Ruling Re Motion to Compel - ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Reassignment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Court Order; Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Order Authorizing Electronic Service; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Recusal;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Court Order re Recusal; Jury Trial Demand; Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00UTLA'S Separate Statement of Items in Dispute; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Message Board Posting IDC is set on @ 1:45 p.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Declaration of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration of Carlos Torres; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration of Ira L. Gottlieb; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00UTLA's Brief on Brach v. Newsom; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Declaration of Carlos Torres; Filed by: United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Final Status Conference And Trial Orders; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit AFFIDAVITS ATTACHED; NA; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference;) of , Initial Status Conference Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) 2 (D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00UTLA's Request to Take Judicial Notice Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Name Change Filed by Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Recusal;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Keshara Shaw (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00UTLA'S Separate Statement of Items in Dispute Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Recusal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Ruling/Orders (Addendum) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Message Board Posting (IDC is set on @ 1:45 p.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00UTLA's Brief on Brach v. Newsom Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Whether a Stay Should Issue Pending R...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration Of Ira L. Gottlieb Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Meet and Confer) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Carlos Torres) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel -Plaintiff's Motion)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Class Certif...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: B315814) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Utla's Costs) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof Of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Appeal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Rulings/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA's Motion for Stay Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Appeal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Appeal;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery; Non-Appearance Case Re...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Motion to File Under Seal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Court's Ruling Re Motion to Compel - Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Preliminary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Joint Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Dis...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Declaration of Carlos Torres Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Ruling/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Rulings/Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Final Status Conference And Trial Orders Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by United Teachers Los Angeles (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Additional Counsel for Plaintiffs)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Application for Expedited Schedule
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of )
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00First Amended Class Action Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((David A. Salyer, CSR# 4410))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Summons on First Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Delivery
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Recusal;) of )
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Hand Delivery
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference;) of , Initial Status Conference Order)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Alma Rosa)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Discovery Schedule)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Maritza Gonzalez)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Josue Ricardo Gastelum-Campista)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of )
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal Records in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Ronnie Heard, Jr.)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA's Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Motion To Compel
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Declaration of Carlos Torres
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APP FOR AN ORDER TO EXPEDITE ACTION)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathry Panish in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Relief Defendant ULTA's Informal Discovery Conference Statement (Stay Motion Pending)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion Supporting USC Re: Stay Pending Related Litigation
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Request for Setting of Renewed OSC Re: Staying this Litigation
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Vicenta Martinez)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Joint Protective Order))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Akela Wroten, Jr.)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Deyanira Hooper)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Payment of Complex Fees
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ex-Parte Proceedings For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Dis...) of )
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Judith Larson)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Utla's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in reply to opposition to demurrer
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Message Board Posting (IDC is set on @ 1:45 p.m.)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Recusal;))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Court Reporter Services of Initial Status Conference Scheduled for October 19, 2020)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Amending Scheduling Order
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Additional Counsel for Plaintiffs)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Preliminary Injunction Discovery
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Dis...))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00UTLA'S Separate Statement of Items in Dispute
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amending Scheduling Order)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Keshara Shaw)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to the LAUSD'S Supplemental Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Ruling/Orders (Addendum)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Supplemental Notice of related cases
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Requests for Production,
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Protective Order
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Whether a Stay Should Issue Pending R...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Los Angeles Unified School District's Motion to Stay
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Preliminary Injunction Discovery)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel -Plaintiff's Motion))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00UTLA's Request to Take Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Non-Parties' Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Supplemental Notice of Related Cases
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA'S Separate Statement of Items in Dispute
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Rulings/Orders
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (To Notice Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA's Motion for Stay
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Request to Take Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Hold Demurrer Hearing for LAUSD and UTLA's Demurrer on July 23)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Name Change
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Preliminary Injunction Depositions Period and Hearing Date
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) Regarding Informal Discovery Conferences)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Notice of Request for Leave to Depose Defendant Superintendent Beutner
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to United Teachers Los Angeles Motions to Stay
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Other - (Los Angeles Unified School District's Informal Discovery Conference Brief)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Relief Defendant UTLA'S Reply to Opposition to Motion for Stay
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Order on Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motions))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Plaintiff's hearing on motion to compel preliminary injunction discover
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified School District's Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified School District's Notice of Lodging
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Hillenbrand in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Ex-Parte Application submitted by Plaintiff on is continued to @ 8:30 a.m.)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in support of Demurrer And Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00United Teachers?Los Angeles' Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Declaration Of Ira L. Gottlieb
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Plaintiffs Leave To Amend Their First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00ULTA's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Opposition to Demurrer
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Amending Preliminary Injunction Deposition, Briefing, and Hearing Schedule
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb in Support of Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Carlos Torres)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Continuing Los Angeles Unified School District's Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applicaion for Expedited Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Supplemental Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00[Corrected] Proof of Service
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Further Amending Motion to Compel Briefing Schedule
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of its second motion to compel preliminary injunction discovery
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Class Certif...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Tax The Los Angeles Unified School District's Costs
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Motion To Dismiss And For Entry Of Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert Carnes ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Tax The LAUSD's Costs)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Ulta's Reply To Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer and Motion To Strike
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Compel Preliminary Injunction Discovery
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For dismissal of action with prejudice and entry of judgment;)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00UTLA's Brief on Brach v. Newsom
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) 2 (D...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Other - (Further Request for Setting of Renewed OSC Re: Staying this Litigation)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief re: Brach v. Newsom
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay Discovery and Take Preliminary Injunction Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (To Notice Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Motion to File Under Seal))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified Scholl District's Reply To Plaintiffs' Opposition To Motion To Compel
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice (APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery; Non-Appearance Case Re...))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified School District's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Proof Of Service
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Ulta's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in response to May 12, 2021 Brown Winfield Order
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application For an Expedited Motion to Compel Hearing and Briefing Schedule
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00ULTA's Response to LAUSD's Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Order granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte application for expedited Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb In Support Of Ex Parte Motion to Stay Discovery)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Final Status Conference And Trial Orders
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Court's Ruling Re Motion to Compel -
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Joint Status Report Re: Status of Appeal
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (Respondent's Designation)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs;))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Order (Dismissing Action With Prejudice And Entry Of Judgment In Favor Of Defendants)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Ruling and Order)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF EDWARD HILLENBRAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX UTLAS COSTS)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: B315814)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To Dismiss And For Entry Of Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Tax United Teachers Los Angeles' Costs
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Utla's Costs)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Joint Status Report RE: Status of Appeal
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb in support of Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified School Districts Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Appeal;))
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APP FOR AN ORDER TO EXPEDITE ACTION)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Additional Counsel for Plaintiffs)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Kathry Panish in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Expedited Schedule))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Additional Counsel for Plaintiffs)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of Court Reporter Services of Initial Status Conference Scheduled for October 19, 2020)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((David A. Salyer, CSR# 4410))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference;) of 10/19/2020, Initial Status Conference Order)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Recusal;) of 10/20/2020)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Recusal;))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of 10/21/2020)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/28/2020)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment) of 11/02/2020)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/17/2020)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Discovery Schedule)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Ronnie Heard, Jr.)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Maritza Gonzalez)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Keshara Shaw)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Josue Ricardo Gastelum-Campista)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Deyanira Hooper)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Judith Larson)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Akela Wroten, Jr.)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Alma Rosa)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings For Expedited Preliminary Injunction Dis...))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Vicenta Martinez)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Ruling/Orders (Addendum)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal Records in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/01/2020)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Joint Protective Order))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order (Authorizing Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Message Board Posting (IDC is set on 2/16/21 @ 1:45 p.m.)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Relief Defendant ULTA's Informal Discovery Conference Statement (Stay Motion Pending)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Other - (Los Angeles Unified School District's Informal Discovery Conference Brief)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Preliminary Injunction Discovery)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Requests for Production,
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Joint) Regarding Informal Discovery Conferences)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Whether a Stay Should Issue Pending R...))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in support of Demurrer And Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amending Scheduling Order)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motions))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Other - (Further Request for Setting of Renewed OSC Re: Staying this Litigation)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) 2 (D...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Edward Hillenbrand in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Responsive Pleading))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Granting Plaintiffs Leave To Amend Their First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Opposition (To Notice Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Preliminary ...))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Motion to File Under Seal))
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Request to Take Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00[Corrected] Proof of Service
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Carlos Torres)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applicaion for Expedited Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Court's Ruling Re Motion to Compel - 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel -Plaintiff's Motion))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay Discovery and Take Preliminary Injunction Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb In Support Of Ex Parte Motion to Stay Discovery)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Class Certif...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For dismissal of action with prejudice and entry of judgment;)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To Dismiss And For Entry Of Judgment)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Order (Dismissing Action With Prejudice And Entry Of Judgment In Favor Of Defendants)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice (APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb in support of Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert Carnes ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Tax The LAUSD's Costs)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (OF EDWARD HILLENBRAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX UTLAS COSTS)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (Respondent's Designation)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA: 09/22/21 B315814)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb in Support of Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Utla's Costs)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs;))
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Ruling and Order)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery; Non-Appearance Case Re...))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (To Notice Of Related Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Ira L. Gottlieb Re: Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Hold Demurrer Hearing for LAUSD and UTLA's Demurrer on July 23)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (Of Ira L. Gottlieb)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re: Supplemental Briefing Schedule)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Los Angeles Unified School District's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Opposition (to the LAUSD'S Supplemental Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.