Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ramirez Jacqueline Carolyn, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Guha Ranojoy, against Kim Stanley, represented by Kroll Steven Mark, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMel Red Recana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: STANLEY KIM (Defendant); As to: JACQUELINE CAROLYN RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: STANLEY KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JACQUELINE CAROLYN RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: STANLEY KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: JACQUELINE CAROLYN RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); As to: STANLEY KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: STANLEY KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JACQUELINE CAROLYN RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)
Date: March 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Proposed)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/06/2021)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.