Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arriaza Adrian, Chiquet Bailey, Clapper Taylor, Cucchi Amanda, Dodson Peyton, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Illovsky Eugene, Kiesel Paul Robert, Mcconnell Mariana Aroditis, against Altria Client Services Llc, Altria Enterprises Llc, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group Inc, Bowen Adam, (total of 11) See All represented by Askew Kevin Michael, Illovsky Eugene, Kramer James N., Schwarz David L., Seaton Lauren B., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging On Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance of Kevin M Askew for Defendant James Monsees; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Statement of Decision Re: Motion to Quash Under Submission; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Ruling Re: Motion to Seal First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Ruling Re: Altria's Motion to Seal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 12, 2023Ruling Re: Motion for Reconsideration and Renewal Re: Motion to Quash; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Appearance for Defendant James Monsees; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Matthew Dirkes; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of Walter F. Brown; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Ruling Re: Non-Management Directors Motion to Seal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff); As to: Juul Labs Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Eugene Illovsky; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Martha Boersch; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of JCCP Coordination order and stay of proceedings; Filed by: Juul Labs Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Filing Plaintiff Amanda Cucchi's Redacted Fact Sheet; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of James Thompson; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Plaintiff Amanda Cucchi's Motion to Seal; Filed by: Adrian Arriaza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Eugene Illovsky; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Matthew Dirkes; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of appearance of Roland Chang for defendant James Monsees; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Altria Group, Inc (Defendant); As to: Juul Labs Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Ruling Re: Motion to Seal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Martha Boersch; Filed by: Adam Bowen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Defendant James Monsees' Notice of Payment of Complex Case Fees; Filed by: James Monsees (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Tentative Ruling
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Payment of Complex Fees
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Martha Boersch)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Matthew Dirkes)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of David E. Kouba ISO Altria Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Verified Application of Michael J. Guzman for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((REDACTED) (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration of Dr. Hoyuong HUH in support of motion to Quash for lack of personal jurisdiction
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of James Thompson
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Verified Application of Mark C. Hansen for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Appearance for Defendant James Monsees)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of hearing on verified application of Michael J. Guzman for Pro Hac Vice admission
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Matthew Dirkes)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Order Granting Verified Application of Michael J. Guzman for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of hearing on verified application of Mark C. Hansen for Pro Hac Vice admission
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Defendant James Monsees' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Personal Injury Exemplar Complaints
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal of Director Defendants, Portions of...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiff Amanda Cucchi's Fact Sheet Under Seal - Unredacted)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ALTRIA DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER AND MOTION TO QUASH
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Defendant James Monsees' Notice of Payment of Complex Case Fees
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment of First Amended Complaints Pursuant to Tentative Ruling
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Order (GRANTING AMANDA CUCCHIS MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Hoyoung Huh's Notice of Motion and Motion to Keep Portions of Deposition Transcript Under Seal
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion re: (PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF AMANDA CUCCHIS PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Plaintiff Amanda Cucchi's Motion to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Plaintiff Amanda Cucchi's Redacted Fact Sheet)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Respond to Plaint...))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Hoyoung Huhs Motion to Keep Portions of Deposition Transcript Under Seal)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 10/15/2020)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;))
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((REDACTED) (1st))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice (of Appearance for Defendant James Monsees)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Further Amending the Deadlines Set Forth in Case Management Order No. 12)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (ISO Altria Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Martha Boersch)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of David E. Kouba ISO Altria Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Matthew Dirkes)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs; Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Martha Boersch)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Matthew Dirkes)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Public Enti...))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal...))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal of Director Defendants, Portions of...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Hearing on Motion to Quash ...))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion re: (PRIVATE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF AMANDA CUCCHIS PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Altria Defendants' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Eugene Illovsky)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Altria Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order Granting Verified Application of Mark C. Hansen for Pro Hac Vice Admission
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (ISO Altria Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Public Enti...))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of appearance of Roland Chang for defendant James Monsees
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Further Amending the Deadlines Set Forth in Case Management Order No. 12)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (Martha Boersch)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Order Granting Director Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of JCCP Coordination order and stay of proceedings
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Non-Management Directors' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to First Amended Complaints for Damages
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs; Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Further Status Conference; Further...))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Motion re: (to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal as counsel of Walter F. Brown
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.