Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Glendale Fire Protection Inc. A California Corporation, Martirossyan Armen, Mcr Construction Inc. A California Corporation, Pashyan Armine, Pashyan Hovanes Aka Hovhannes Pashyan Aka Hovhannes Pashyan, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Howard Elmira R., Keropian Ara Joe, Kirakosian Levon, Woolfall Brian Derek, against Giniani Corp. Dba Los Angeles Cast Stone, Mcr Construction Inc., Pashyan Hovanes Aka Hovhannes Pashyan Aka Hovhannes Pashyan, represented by Kasendorf Alexander Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Terry A. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry A. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Armen Martirossyan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Default entered as to Armen Martirossyan; On the Complaint filed by Mkrtich Setoyan on
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Further Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Court's Order for Demurrer hearing held ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Mkrtich Setoyan on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Armen Martirossyan (Cross-Defendant); As to: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff); As to: Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant); Armine Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant); Armine Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Alexander Samuel Kasendorf (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by MCR Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Glendale Fire Protection Inc. a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mkrtich Setoyan (Cross-Defendant); As to: Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate Certificate of Merit; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hudson Insurance Company, a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Court's Order for Demurrer hearing held Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Certificate (Certificate of Merit) Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Further Case Management Conference) Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by J&S Electrical Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by MOES 1 through 20 (Cross-Defendant); Giniani Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling) Filed by Glendale Fire Protection Inc. a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant); Armine Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entrt of Judgment or Order) Filed by ARPA Technology Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Hovhannes Pashyan, Trustee of the Hovhannes Pashyan Living Trust Dated (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Darling Plastering Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint) Filed by Mkrtich Setoyan (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ((3rd)) Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Hovanes Pashyan (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Glendale Fire Protection Inc. a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service Filed by ARPA Technology Group, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by Roe 1 Erroneously Sued As Sure Tec Insurance Company (Defendant on defendant's claim)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CROSS-DEFENDANT MCR CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Answer (OF DEFENDANT HOVANES PASHYAN AKA HOVHANNES PASHYAN TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Setting Aside Default Against Cross-Defendant Armen Martirossyan)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of )
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate (Certificate of Merit)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Further Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amended Stipulated Case Management Order and (Proposed) Order Thereon)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Court's Order for Demurrer hearing held
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 AND ORDER OF THE COURT)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Answer (TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT BY HOVANES PASHYAN)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order re Case Management Order)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Objection (to [Proposed] Order RE Trial Continuance and Second Amended Stipulated Case Management Order)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate (Certificate of Merit)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Answer (OF DEFENDANT HOVANES PASHYAN AKA HOVHANNES PASHYAN TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Setting Aside Default Against Cross-Defendant Armen Martirossyan)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/05/2021)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 04/09/2021)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Further Status Conference) of 06/08/2021)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Further Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Amended Stipulated Case Management Order and (Proposed) Order Thereon)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 AND ORDER OF THE COURT)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CROSS-DEFENDANT MCR CONSTRUCTION, INC.?S OBJECTIONS TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order re Case Management Order)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Court's Order for Demurrer hearing held 12/14/21
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/17/2021)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
February 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
February 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service |
|
January 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to Cross-Defendants Magic, GV, and C&C |
|
January 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) |
|
October 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
October 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV36066 Hearing Date: October 13, 2023 Dept: 14 Instant Motion Cross-Complainant Pashyans now move this court for an order continuing trial to February 5, 2024. Decision The motion is... | |
October 13, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 | |
October 13, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Jury Trial scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.