Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Concept Renovations Inc., Matian Shawn, Moshiri Sharry, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith Samuel J. Esq., against Matian Shawn, Moshiri Sharry, represented by Bailey Terry Robert, Bederman David Samuel, Treyzon Boris, Harutunian Michael, Ring Bart Ivan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Marie Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 18, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 18, 2020Complaint
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Shawn Matian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Shawn Matian (Defendant); Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shawn Matian (Defendant); Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Shawn Matian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (of Errata to Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Filed by Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Informal Discovery Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00General Denial Filed by THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of IDC Re: Responses to Special Interrogatories) Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant); Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery");)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant); Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Shawn Matian (Cross-Complainant); Sharry Moshiri (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant); Sharry Moshiri (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Shawn Matian (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Concept Renovations, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/01/2020)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Informal Discovery Conference;))
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery");))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of IDC Re: Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.