Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rodriguez Luis, Rodriguez Yaninna, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jacobson Kevin, against General Motors Llc, represented by Davis Stacey S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Yaninna Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Yaninna Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Yaninna Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Yaninna Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Yaninna Rodriguez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/09/2021)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/03/2021)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Vehicle In...))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF STACEY DAVIS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CMC)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.