Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chavez Juan Manuel, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Schelly Thomas H, Schelly Thomas Henry, against Garcia Fernando, Gomez Fernando, The Bicycle Casino Community Foundation Aka The Bicycle Hotel & Casino A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Complaint
Date: September 16, 2020Complaint
Date: September 16, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal - NOT ENTERED; Filed by: Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: June 08, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED) Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Juan Manuel Chavez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of )
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of )
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge;) of 09/24/2020)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.